Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760222

EP0760222 - Filter for preparing drinks by extraction, in particular espresson [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Braun GmbH
Kronberg / DE
[1999/50]
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
Braun Aktiengesellschaft
Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Friedrich, Dieter
Hauptstrasse 159
65817 Vockenhausen / DE
02 / Seidel, Gunther
Antoniusstrasse 15
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / Machlitt, Michael
Mecklenburgerstrasse 65
65824 Schwalbach / DE
04 / Eimecke, Rolf
Brahmsstrasse 29
63179 Obertshausen / DE
05 / Koch, Dieter
Otto-Hahn-Strasse 5
30982 Pattensen / DE
06 / Miltenberger, Christof
Altkönigstrasse 6
61389 Schmitten / DE
07 / Wirsing, Robert
Sudetenring 152
63303 Dreieich / DE
[1997/10]
Application number, filing date96112070.626.07.1996
[1997/10]
Priority number, dateDE199513248102.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19532481
[1997/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0760222
Date:05.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0760222
Date:16.04.1997
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760222
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/06
[1997/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [1997/10]
TitleGerman:Filtermittel zur Filtration von Extraktionsgetränken, insbesondere von Espresso[1997/10]
English:Filter for preparing drinks by extraction, in particular espresson[1997/10]
French:Filtre pour préparer des boissons par extraction, de l'espresso en particulier[1997/10]
Examination procedure09.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1999Fee for grant paid
02.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES27.07.2000
FR31.07.2000
[2008/41]
Former [2004/28]ES27.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0515245  (SEB SA [FR]);
 [A]GB1115787  (VACUUM DIE CASTING CORP) [A] * page 12, line 90 - line 115; figures 38,39 *;
 [A]US1666070  (PAGE CHARLES E)