blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0793250

EP0793250 - Electron gun assembling apparatus and method of assembling electron gun [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/36]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Yasuki
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
02 / Shirase, Takashi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
03 / Okamura, Masamitsu
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
04 / Maezono, Shuichi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
[1997/36]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/36]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96112119.126.07.1996
[1997/36]
Priority number, dateJP1996004196928.02.1996         Original published format: JP 4196996
[1997/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0793250
Date:03.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0793250
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.1997
ClassificationIPC:H01J9/18
[1997/36]
CPC:
H01J9/06 (KR); H01J9/18 (EP,US); H01J2209/185 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/36]
TitleGerman:Elektronenkanone-Montageeinrichtung und Montageverfahren der Elektronenkanone[1997/36]
English:Electron gun assembling apparatus and method of assembling electron gun[1997/36]
French:Dispositif d'assemblage d'un canon à électron et procédé d'assemblage d'un canon à électron[1997/36]
Examination procedure04.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
02.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.1999Fee for grant paid
17.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS60117524  ;
 [A]JPS60193230  ;
 [A]EP0296008  (VIDEOCOLOR [FR]) [A] 1,13 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 39 *;
 [DA]JPH0227635
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851031), vol. 009, no. 274, Database accession no. (E - 354), & JP60117524 A 19850625 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860212), vol. 010, no. 035, Database accession no. (E - 380), & JP60193230 A 19851001 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,13 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900330), vol. 014, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 0913), & JP02027635 A 19900130 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1,13 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.