EP0768365 - Process for the removal of highly concentrated carbon dioxide from high-pressure natural gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Masaki, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mitsuoka, Shigeaki, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 6-22, Kan-on-shinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112162.1 | 26.07.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950256174 | 03.10.1995 Original published format: JP 25617495 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768365 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768365 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C10L3/10 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
C10L3/10 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von hochkonzentriertem Kohlendioxid aus unter hohem Druck stehendem Erdgas | [1997/20] | English: | Process for the removal of highly concentrated carbon dioxide from high-pressure natural gas | [1997/16] | French: | Procédé de séparation de dioxyde de carbone à haute concentration à partir de gaz naturel à haute pression | [1997/16] |
Former [1997/16] | Verfahren zur Entfernung von hochkonzentriertem Kohlendioxid aus hoch-druck Erdgas | Examination procedure | 23.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3642430 (BENSON HOMER E) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4853012 (BATTEUX JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-4* claims 1,3 * |