Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0822268

EP0822268 - Process for depositing adherent diamond thin films [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Michigan State University
238 Administration Building
East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/06]For all designated states
MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY
238 Administration Building
East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ulczynski, Michael J.
1491 Bay Meadows
Okemos, Michigan 48864 / US
02 / Asmussen, Jes
3811 Viceroy
Okemos, Michigan 48864 / US
03 / Reinhard, Donnie K.
526 Mashall Street
East Lansing, Michigan 48823 / US
[1998/06]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/06]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96112277.730.07.1996
[1998/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0822268
Date:04.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0822268
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/26, C23C16/44
[1998/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer haftenden Diamantbeschichtung[1998/06]
English:Process for depositing adherent diamond thin films[1998/06]
French:Procédé de production d'un revêtement de diamant adhérent[1998/06]
Examination procedure30.07.1996Examination requested  [1998/06]
01.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1999Fee for grant paid
22.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0457076  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 29 - line 30; example 1 *;
 [Y]  - GONON P ET AL, "RAMAN STUDY OF DIAMOND FILMS DEPOSITED BY MPCVD: EFFECT OF THE SUBSTRATE POSITION", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19950201), vol. 256, no. 1/02, pages 13 - 22, XP000495251 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(94)06306-0
 [Y]  - HIRAMATSU M ET AL, "Hydrogen-radical-assisted radio-frequency plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition system for diamond formation", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, JUNE 1996, AIP, USA, ISSN 0034-6748, vol. 67, no. 6, pages 2360 - 2365, XP000615708 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENT*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1146946
 [Y]  - KIM H ET AL, "Effect of the substrate state on the formation of diamond film in a low temperature microwave-plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition system", 41ST NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM OF THE AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, DENVER, CO, USA, 24-29 OCT. 1994, ISSN 0734-2101, JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY A (VACUUM, SURFACES, AND FILMS), MAY-JUNE 1995, USA, vol. 13, no. 3, pt.2, pages 1619 - 1623, XP000615711 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENT*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.579740
 [AD]  - MASOOD A ET AL, "Techniques for patterning of CVD diamond films on non-diamond substrates", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, NOV. 1991, USA, ISSN 0013-4651, vol. 138, no. 11, pages L67 - L68, XP000615408 [AD] 8 * page L67, column L, line 26 - column R, line 17 *
 [A]  - NARIMAN K E ET AL, "GROWTH OF FREE-STANDING DIAMOND FILMS ON GLASS", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (19910501), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 391 - 394, XP000321249 [A] 9 * page 392, column L, line 43 - line 50 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm00015a008
 [A]  - REIHARD D K ET AL, "Diamond coatings on integrated circuits", DATABASE INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002021717 [A] 10 * abstract *
    [] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE APPLIED DIAMOND CONFERENCE 1995. APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERIALS: THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (NIST SP 885), PROCEEDINGS OF 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERI, 1995, GAITHERSBURG, MD, USA, NIST, USA, pages 643 - 646 vol.1,
 [A]  - ULCZYNSKI M ET AL, "Thin film diamond coatings on glass", DATABASE INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002021718 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
    [] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE APPLIED DIAMOND CONFERENCE 1995. APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERIALS: THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (NIST SP 885), PROCEEDINGS OF 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERI, 1995, GAITHERSBURG, MD, USA, NIST, USA, pages 573 - 576 vol.1,