blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0756958

EP0756958 - Seat slide device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2000 [2000/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/06]For all designated states
FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimata, Toshihiro
c/o Fujikiko K.K., Washizu-kojyo, 2028 Washizu
Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Negi, Yoshitaka
c/o Fujikiko K.K., Washizu-kojyo, 2028 Washizu
Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[1997/06]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/06]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96112388.231.07.1996
[1997/06]
Priority number, dateJP1995019672701.08.1995         Original published format: JP 19672795
[1997/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0756958
Date:05.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0756958
Date:25.02.1998
[1998/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/06
[1997/06]
CPC:
B60N2/0705 (EP); B60N2/071 (EP); B60N2/0715 (EP);
B60N2/075 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1997/06]
TitleGerman:Sitzgleitschiene[1997/06]
English:Seat slide device[1997/06]
French:Glissière pour sièges[1997/06]
Examination procedure31.07.1996Examination requested  [1997/06]
04.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/40]
10.05.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2000/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0484024  (DUNLOP COX LTD) [Y] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [YA]EP0516546  (FUJI KIKO KK) [Y] 1,5 * the whole document, especially figures 3, 6 and 9 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE3522773  (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE) [A] 1,3 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2219933  (TI COX LTD) [A] 1,4 * figure - *;
 [A]US4516811  (AKIYAMA YOSHINORI ET AL) [A] 1-4 * figures 2,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.