Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0758636

EP0758636 - Process for the treatment of waste water from a bisphenol-A preparation process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[1997/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Meurer, Kurt-Peter, Dr.
Reuterstrasse 1
51375 Leverkusen / DE
02 / Van Osselaer, Tony, Dr.
Tuinlaan 62
9100 Belsele / BE
03 / Hinz, Jürgen, Dr.
Schriewerstrasse 38
47800 Krefeld / DE
04 / Augustin, Thomas, Dr.
Amsterdamer Strasse 70
50735 Köln / DE
[1997/08]
Application number, filing date96112423.701.08.1996
[1997/08]
Priority number, dateDE199512985414.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19529854
DE199513288806.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19532888
[1997/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0758636
Date:19.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0758636
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C37/72, C07C37/82, C02F1/26, C02F1/28, B01D11/04, B01D15/00
[1997/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   IT,   NL [1997/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung des Prozessabwassers des Bisphenol-A-Verfahrens[1997/08]
English:Process for the treatment of waste water from a bisphenol-A preparation process[1997/08]
French:Procédé pour le traitement des eaux usées du procédé de préparation du bisphénol-A[1997/08]
Examination procedure19.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/42]
15.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4469561  (SIKDAR SUBHAS K ET AL) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US4374283  (ANEJA VINEY P) [X] 1 * column 4, line 27 - line 60; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4400553  (ANEJA VINEY P) [A] 1