Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0762541

EP0762541 - Device for calibrating and testing transmit/receive moduls in an active electronically phased array antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EADS Deutschland GmbH
81663 München / DE
[2002/20]
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schäffner, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing.
Hörenzhauser Strasse 3
85386 Eching / DE
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Meel, Thomas
c/o Dornier GmbH
Patentabteilung
88039 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]Meel, Thomas
Dornier GmbH L H G
88039 Friedrichshafen / DE
Application number, filing date96112548.102.08.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateDE199513175729.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19531757
[1997/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0762541
Date:12.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0762541
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01Q21/00, H01Q3/26, G01S7/40
[2000/02]
Former International [1997/11]H01Q21/00, H01Q3/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/11]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zum Kalibrieren und Testen von Sende/Empfangs-Modulen in einer aktiven elektronisch phasengesteuerten Gruppenantenne[1997/11]
English:Device for calibrating and testing transmit/receive moduls in an active electronically phased array antenna[1997/11]
French:Dispositif pour calibrer et éprouver des modules émetteurs/récepteurs dans un réseau d'antennes actives à commande électroniqe de phase[1997/11]
Examination procedure08.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
02.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
13.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.199803   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1998
31.08.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5353031  (RATHI DEV D) [A] 1,3,5 * figure 4 * * column 1, lines 10,11 * * column 6, line 51 - line 53 *;
 [DA]DE4203932  (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE) [DA] 1 * figures 1,3 * * column 4, line 15 - line 28 *;
 [A]DE4136801  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * claim 1 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5412414  (AST HARRY C ET AL) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 4,5 * * Summary of the Invention *