Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0761920

EP0761920 - Window/door with pivot and/or tilting fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pax GmbH
Gewerbegebiet Rüsterbaum, Vorderer Böhl 39
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
Pax GmbH
Gewerbegebiet Rüsterbaum, Vorderer Böhl 39
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Alt, Albert
Weiherheck 2a
54426 Malborn / DE
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel
Patentanwälte
Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Former [1997/11]Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler, Dipl.-Ing. Michael Füssel, Brahmstrasse 29
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date96112699.207.08.1996
[1997/11]
Priority number, dateDE1995213098U16.08.1995         Original published format: DE 29513098 U
[1997/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0761920
Date:12.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0761920
Date:20.08.1997
[1997/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0761920
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0761920
Date:18.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:E05C9/06, E05C9/18, E05D15/52
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1997/11]
TitleGerman:Fenster/Tür mit Dreh-Kipp-Beschlag[1997/11]
English:Window/door with pivot and/or tilting fitting[1997/11]
French:Fenêtre/porte avec battant pivotant et/ou basculant[1997/11]
Examination procedure11.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
23.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.1999Fee for grant paid
12.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.09.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.
Postfach 10 05 51
57005 Siegen / DE
 02  04.10.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1-15
D-33609 Bielefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.
Postfach 10 05 51
57005 Siegen / DE
 02  04.10.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1-15
D-33609 Bielefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2003/15]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.
Postfach 10 05 51
57005 Siegen / DE
 02  04.10.2000  18.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1-15
D-33609 Bielefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck Stracke Loesenbeck Patentanwälte Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2000/48]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.2000   
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
 02  04.10.2000   
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1-15
D-33609 Bielefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning
Loesenbeck Stracke Loesenbeck Patentanwälte Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2000/47]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.2000   
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
04.12.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.07.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.07.2002Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2003Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
12.05.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.05.2004Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.07.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.12.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.03.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Stay/Interruption01.05.2001Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2001/30]
16.11.2001Resumption of proceedings[2001/30]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK07.08.2001
GB07.08.2001
SE08.08.2001
AT07.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
FR29.04.2005
[2005/46]
Former [2005/36]DK07.08.2001
GB07.08.2001
SE08.08.2001
AT07.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
Former [2005/25]DK07.08.2001
GB07.08.2001
SE08.08.2001
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
Former [2003/46]DK07.08.2001
GB07.08.2001
SE08.08.2001
Former [2002/37]GB07.08.2001
SE08.08.2001
Former [2002/26]SE08.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE9308472U  (PAX SCHWEIKHARD GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 8, line 19 - line 33; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]DE8614557U  (SIEGENIA-FRANK KG) [A] 1 * page 12, line 5 - line 9; figure - *;
 [A]GB2147657  (RSB HOLDING & MANAGEMENT AG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 35; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0012786  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4009637  (SAELZER SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *