Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0823687

EP0823687 - Computer network and method for the approval of building and construction plans [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.01.2002  [2002/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seib, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Josef-Wächter-Strasse 4
97332 Volkach / DE
For all designated states
Fersch, Andreas Dipl.-Ing.
Weinbergstrasse 7
97259 Greussenheim / DE
[2001/02]
Former [1998/07]For all designated states
Seib, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Josef-Wächter-Strasse 4
97332 Volkach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/02]
Former [1998/07]01 / Seib, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Josef-Wächter-Strasse 4
97332 Volkach / DE
02 / Fersch, Andreas
Weinbergstrasse 7
97259 Greussenheim / DE
Representative(s)Zangs, Rainer E. , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]Zangs, Rainer E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date96112894.909.08.1996
[1998/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0823687
Date:11.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0823687
Date:31.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G06F17/50
[1998/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1998/43]
Former [1998/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Computernetzwerk und Verfahren zur Freigabe von Bau- und Konstruktionsplänen[1998/07]
English:Computer network and method for the approval of building and construction plans[1998/07]
French:Réseau d'ordinateurs et procédé d'approbation des plans de construction[1998/07]
Examination procedure22.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
12.08.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.11.1998Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
05.07.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
22.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2000Fee for grant paid
30.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.09.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.09.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5239466  (MORGAN DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 27 - column 8, line 55 *;
 [X]US5040142  (MORI KENJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 7, line 47 - column 10, line 55 *;
 [X]EP0387462  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0269875  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract *