Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828120

EP0828120 - Device for delivering metered quantities of ice cubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wessamat Eismaschinen Fabrik GmbH
Industriegebiet 1
67686 Mackenbach / DE
[1998/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Ditscher, Leo
Maxstr. 13 2/3
66879 Obermohr / DE
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB
Westring 17
76829 Landau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich
Westring 17
76829 Landau / DE
Application number, filing date96113126.516.08.1996
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828120
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828120
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:F25C5/00
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1998/48]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Abgeben dosierter Mengen von Kleineiskörpern[1998/11]
English:Device for delivering metered quantities of ice cubes[1998/11]
French:Dispositif pour délivrer des quantités dosées de glaçons[1998/11]
Examination procedure18.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
12.09.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.12.1998Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2000Fee for grant paid
15.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.10.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.10.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3211338  (WEIL ALBERT G, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 3 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP0455057  (GAGGENAU WERKE [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4732301  (TOBIAS LAMAR K [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5316195  (MOKSNES STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 31 - column 11, line 52; figures 1,3,7 *;
 [A]US3913343  (ROWLAND MICHAEL L, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 17 - column 8, line 37; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4189063  (MATTHIESEN RALPH F [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4981237  (LANDERS JERRY [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 13; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH06176266  ;
 [A]US3341065  (SCHULDT DONALD A, et al);
 [A]US4787539  (UCHIDA NAOYA [JP], et al);
 [A]US3722755  (NAKASHIMA S, et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940928), vol. 18, no. 516, Database accession no. (P - 1806), & JP06176266 A 19940624 (FUJI ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * abstract *