Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0771087

EP0771087 - Photonic interconnect and photonic processing for communication and data handling satellites [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2002  [2002/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW INC.
One Space Park, Bldg. E1/4021 Redondo Beach
California 90278 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]For all designated states
TRW INC.
One Space Park, Bldg. E1/4021
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kintis, Mark
1636 Voorhees Avenue
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
02 / Isara, Scott K.
5524 Norton Street
Torrance, CA 90503-1254 / US
03 / Brock, John C.
2814 Faber Street
Redonda Beach, CA 90278 / US
04 / Tittle, Lawrence R.
4157 Via Solano
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274 / US
05 / Pawlowski, Peter R.
2523 N. Valley Drive
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date96113312.120.08.1996
[1997/18]
Priority number, dateUS1995054853526.10.1995         Original published format: US 548535
[1997/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0771087
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0771087
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/00
[1997/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/18]
TitleGerman:Photonische Verbindung und photonische Datenverarbeitung für Nachrichten- und Datenverarbeitungssatelliten[1997/18]
English:Photonic interconnect and photonic processing for communication and data handling satellites[1997/18]
French:Interconnexion photonique et traitement photonique pour satellites de communication et de traitement de données[1997/18]
Examination procedure16.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
28.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/07]
06.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5173794  (CHEUNG KWOK-WAI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 7; figures 1,3 * [Y] 3,8-11,13-19;
 [YA]US5450223  (WAGNER HARVEY LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 3,9-11,13,14,16-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 37 * [A] 1,10;
 [Y]GB2267006  (ALCATEL ESPACE [FR]) [Y] 8,15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5424862  (GLYNN THOMAS W [US]) [A] 1-10,16 * abstract *;
 [A]US4928317  (FRANCHINI ELISABETH [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,10-12,16,17 * abstract *