Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0764982

EP0764982 - Process for manufacturing an integrated CMOS circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/50]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schwalke, Udo, Dr.
Gewerbestr. 22
84431 Heldenstein / DE
[1997/13]
Representative(s)Zedlitz, Peter , et al
OSRAM GmbH
Intellectual Property IP
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. , et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date96114027.402.09.1996
[1997/13]
Priority number, dateDE199513562925.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19535629
[1997/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0764982
Date:26.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0764982
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/8238
[1997/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer integrierten CMOS-Schaltung[1997/13]
English:Process for manufacturing an integrated CMOS circuit[1997/13]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un circuit CMOS intégré[1997/13]
Examination procedure21.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
24.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2001Fee for grant paid
12.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Request for further processing for:20.07.2001Request for further processing filed
20.07.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.08.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5438214  (EGAWA YUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-10 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 62; figure - *;
 [Y]US4847213  (PFIESTER JAMES R [US]) [Y] 1,5-7,10 * column 2, line 19 - column 5, line 53; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0660394  (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,6,10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]USRE34158E  (A. WATANABE ET AL) [Y] 8 * figure - *;
 [Y]DE4110645  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 9 * figure - *;
 [DA]  D. YU ET AL, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HIGH SPEED ELECTRONICS AND SYSTEMS, (1994), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 135 - 143, XP000195617 [DA] 8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1142/S0129156494000073