Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0763367

EP0763367 - Method for testing at least one filter mounted in a dialyse circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE
[2002/18]
Former [1997/33]For all designated states
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Gluckensteinweg 5
61350 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Former [1997/12]For all designated states
Fresenius AG
Gluckensteinweg 5
D-61350 Bad Homburg v.d.H / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wamsiedler, Ralf
Lärchenstr.3
97469 Gochsheim-Weyher / DE
02 / Mathieu, Bernd, Dr.
Hans-Sachs-Strasse 11
66583 Spiesen / DE
 [2003/26]
Former [2003/12]01 / Wamsiedler, Ralf
Lerchenweg 3
97469 Gochsheim-Weyher / DE
02 / Mathieu, Bernd, Dr.
Hans-Sachs-Strasse 11
66583 Spiesen / DE
Former [1997/12]01 / Wamsiedler, Ralf
Homburger Strasse 27
61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE
02 / Mathieu, Bernd, Dr.
Am Europadorf 55
66583 Spiesen-Elversberg / DE
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1997/12]Fuchs, Luderschmidt & Partner
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date96114208.005.09.1996
[1997/12]
Priority number, dateDE199513441716.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19534417
[1997/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0763367
Date:19.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0763367
Date:02.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/34
[1997/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Überprüfen von mindestens einem, in einem Dialysierflüssigkeitssystem angeordneten Filter[2002/50]
English:Method for testing at least one filter mounted in a dialyse circuit[1997/12]
French:Méthode pour tester au moins un filtre monté dans un circuit de dialyse[1997/12]
Former [1997/12]Verfahren zum Überprüfen von mindestens einem, in einem Dialysierflüssigkeitssystem
Examination procedure19.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/17]
25.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2003Fee for grant paid
26.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0491981  (FRESENIUS AG) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 5 *;
 [YD]DE3448262  (FRESENIUS AG) [YD] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8305713U  (SARTORIUS GMBH) [A] 3 * page 12, line 29 - line 32 *;
 [A]US4872974  (S HIRAYAMA) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 46 *;
 [A]US4614109  (HOFMANN FRIEDER) [A] 1