Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0764546

EP0764546 - Recording material for the ink-jet printing process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Felix Schoeller jr Foto- und Spezialpapiere GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
Felix Schoeller jr Foto- und Spezialpapiere GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Westfal, Horst
Am Westerteich 21
49191 Belm / DE
02 / Diekmann, Andreas
Kronenweg 8
49170 Hagen / DE
03 / Lönker, Sonja
Langer Sand 10
49134 Wallenhorst / DE
[1997/13]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96114450.810.09.1996
[1997/13]
Priority number, dateDE199513507221.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19535072
[1997/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0764546
Date:26.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0764546
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00
[1997/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1997/13]
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsmaterial für das Ink Jet Druckverfahren[1997/13]
English:Recording material for the ink-jet printing process[1997/13]
French:Matériau d'enregistrement convenable pour le procédé d'impression par jet d'encre[1997/13]
Examination procedure20.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
18.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0636489  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 3 - line 41 *;
 [X]WO9420303  (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 6 - line 17 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 2 * * page 31, line 10 - line 15 * * page 33, line 18 - page 34, line 17 *;
 [X]US4946741  (AONO TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 30 - line 55 * * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 32 * * example - *;
 [A]US4474847  (SCHROEDER HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 56 *;
 [D]DE3024205  ;
 [A]EP0445327  (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 6 * * example - *
ExaminationEP0298424