EP0786525 - Method for improving the growth and the colorimetric determination of bacteria, yeast, fungi or coccus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotest AG Landsteinerstrasse 5 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states BIOTEST AG Landsteinerstrasse 5 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Jürgen, Dr. Kurt-Schumacher Ring 83 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Strych, Werner Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 70 08 60 81308 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/31] | Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40 65901 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114529.9 | 11.09.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | DE1996102345 | 24.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19602345 | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786525 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786525 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vebesserung des Wachstums und des kolorimetrischen Nachweises von Bakterien, Hefen, Pilzen oder Kokken | [1997/31] | English: | Method for improving the growth and the colorimetric determination of bacteria, yeast, fungi or coccus | [1997/31] | French: | Méthode pour améliorer la croissance et la détermination colorimétrique des bactéries, des leuvres, des champignons ou des coccus | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3983003 (SKINSNES OLAF K, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4168204 (WILLIAMS WILMORE); | [X]EP0167724 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0223685 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4316394 (BIOTEST AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8,9* the whole document * |