Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766492

EP0766492 - Method for common use of a time multiplexed transmission channel by plural transmitters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2003  [2003/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Prey, Gerhard
Kiefernstrasse 24
82223 Eichenau / DE
[1997/14]
Application number, filing date96114665.112.09.1996
[1997/14]
Priority number, dateDE199513625128.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19536251
[1997/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0766492
Date:02.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0766492
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/413
[1997/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur gemeinsamen Nutzung eines Zeitmultiplexübertragungskanals durch eine Mehrzahl von Sendern[1997/14]
English:Method for common use of a time multiplexed transmission channel by plural transmitters[1997/14]
French:Méthode d'utilisation commune par plusieurs émetteurs d'un canal à multiplexage temporel[1997/14]
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
31.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/42]
13.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DYA]EP0234355  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4;
 [Y]EP0399359  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 20 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0263421  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3248446  (PHILIPS KOMMUNIKATIONS IND AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0060517  (SIP [IT])
 [A]  AHUJA S R, "S/NET: A HIGH SPEED INTERCONNECT FOR MULTIPLE COMPUTERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, ROSEMOUNT, ILLINOIS, (19840924), vol. 38, XP000811031 [A] 1,4 * page 245, paragraph 1. * * pages 246-247, paragraph 2.3 *