EP0764708 - Antistatic polyester film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Shinichiro Sagamihara Res. Ctr. of Teijin Ltd., 37-19, Oyama 3-chome, Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Toshifumi Sagamihara Res. Ctr. of Teijin Ltd., 37-19, Oyama 3-chome, Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229 / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Masayuki Sagamihara Res. Ctr. of Teijin Ltd., 37-19, Oyama 3-chome, Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229 / JP | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114860.8 | 17.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | JP19950241502 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24150295 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764708 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764708 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764708 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/16, C08K5/00 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
C09K3/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (KR);
B32B27/18 (KR);
B32B27/20 (KR);
C08K5/0075 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | C09K3/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | Antistatische Filmträger auf Basis von Polyester | [1997/13] | English: | Antistatic polyester film | [1997/13] | French: | Film antistatique en polyester | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS4740600B ; | [YD]JPH07156357 ; | [YP]JPH08169096 ; | [A]JPS61285232 ; | [A]US3997701 (EALDING CYRIL JOHN, et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]US4115334 (GEROW CLARE WILLIAM) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 72, no. 42, Database accession no. 72-67712t, XP002032249 & JPS4740600B B2 00000000 (ASAHI) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [YD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 33, Database accession no. 95-251434, XP002032250 & JPH07156357 A 00000000 (TEIJIN) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * | [YP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 36, Database accession no. 96-357847, XP002032251 & JPH08169096 A 00000000 (DIAFOIL HOECHST) [YP] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 04, Database accession no. 87-026976, XP002032252 & JPS61285232 A 00000000 (DAIKIN) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |