Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766459

EP0766459 - Image recording/reproducing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Tokai Electric Company
1410 Inada Hitachinaka-ski
Ibaraki 312 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Tokai Electric Company
1410 Inada
Hitachinaka-ski, Ibaraki 312 / JP
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
Tokai Electric Company
1410 Inada
Hitachinaka-ski, Ibaraki 312 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yatsugi, Tomishige
426-3, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
02 / Kimura, Masayuki
2660-39, Mawatari
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
[1997/14]
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date96115037.219.09.1996
[1997/14]
Priority number, dateJP1995024791626.09.1995         Original published format: JP 24791695
[1997/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0766459
Date:02.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0766459
Date:09.02.2000
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0766459
Date:16.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225
[1997/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [1997/14]
TitleGerman:System zum Aufzeichnen/Wiedergeben eines Bildes[1997/14]
English:Image recording/reproducing system[1997/14]
French:Système d'enregistrement/de reproduction d'image[1997/14]
Examination procedure19.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/14]
16.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2001Fee for grant paid
09.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0541449  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-7,12 * column 12, line 23 - line 46; figure 2 * * column 11, line 12 - line 23 * [A] 9-11,14-19,21-23;
 [YA]US4547809  (SOUTHGATE PETER D [US]) [Y] 1-7,12 * column 3, line 1 - line 17; figure 1 * [A] 8,20;
 [A]US5376965  (NAGASAKI TATSUO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5377060  (NIGAM ANIL [US]) [A] 8,20 * column 7, line 38 - line 42; figure 2A *