Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0778679

EP0778679 - Radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R & S BICK Mobilfunk GmbH
Fritz-Hahne-Strasse 7
31848 Bad Münder / DE
[2002/10]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
R & S BICK Mobilfunk GmbH
Im Landerfeld 7
31848 Bad Münder / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rieder, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Unterflossing 7
84570 Polling / DE
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur. , et al
GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Former [2000/26]Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [1997/51]Graf, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [1997/24]Graf, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.
Sckellstrasse 1
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date96115196.621.09.1996
[1997/24]
Priority number, dateDE199514239014.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19542390
[1997/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0778679
Date:11.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0778679
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/24]
TitleGerman:Funknetz[1997/24]
English:Radio network[1997/24]
French:Réseau radio[1997/24]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/19]
03.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
16.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US4935927  (KAEWELL JR JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 13,14 * * column 1, line 46 - column 1, line 61 * * column 6, line 3 - column 6, line 28 *;
 [E]WO9707603  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [E] 1-7 * figures 3,4,7 * * page 17, line 5 - page 18, line 32 * * page 22, line 25 - line 29 * * page 23, line 8 - line 23 *;
 [A]WO9417605  (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0667725  (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 37-44 * * column 4, line 37 - line 44 *;
 [A]WO9405101  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 2 *