Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774831

EP0774831 - Circuit arrangement for generating a clock frequency for a data transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KE KOMMUNIKATIONS-ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO
Kabelkamp 20
D-30179 Hannover / DE
[1997/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Hennig, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Raiffeisenstrasse 3
30827 Garbsen / DE
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Döring, Roger , et al
Alcatel
Intellectual Property Department
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Döring, Roger , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/45]Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Former [1997/21]Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing.
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date96115256.824.09.1996
[1997/21]
Priority number, dateDE199514311518.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19543115
[1997/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0774831
Date:21.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0774831
Date:22.04.1998
[1998/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0774831
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03B19/16
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/21]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung einer Taktfrequenz für ein Datenübertragungssystem[1997/21]
English:Circuit arrangement for generating a clock frequency for a data transmission system[1997/21]
French:Agencement de circuit pour générer une fréquence d'horloge pour un système de transmission de données[1997/21]
Examination proceduredeletedApplication refused, date of legal effect [2000/23]
18.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/20]
15.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.01.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/20]
25.01.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/23]
04.02.2000Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/20]
20.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2000Fee for grant paid
06.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
FR08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
IT08.11.2000
NL08.11.2000
DK08.02.2001
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
GR09.02.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]ES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
FR08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
NL08.11.2000
DK08.02.2001
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
GR09.02.2001
Former [2004/51]ES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
NL08.11.2000
DK08.02.2001
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
GR09.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
Former [2003/46]ES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
NL08.11.2000
DK08.02.2001
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
Former [2003/09]ES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
NL08.11.2000
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
Former [2002/26]ES08.11.2000
FI08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
Former [2002/17]FI08.11.2000
IE08.11.2000
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
Former [2002/11]FI08.11.2000
PT08.02.2001
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
IE27.07.2001
Former [2002/10]FI08.11.2000
SE08.02.2001
FR06.04.2001
IE27.07.2001
Former [2001/51]FI08.11.2000
SE08.02.2001
Former [2001/29]FI08.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5434522  (FIKART JOSEF L [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 31; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3593156  (JORDAN HARLEY D) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 39 - line 70; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4213185  (DOYLE JAMES T [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 29; figure 1 *
 [Y]  MARTIN R ET AL, "A KU-BAND OSCILLATOR SUBSYSTEM USING A BROADBAND GAAS MMIC PUSH-PULL AMPLIFIER/DOUBLER", IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS, (19911101), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 348 - 350, XP000230630 [Y] 1 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/75.93908