Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0765892

EP0765892 - Aminopropylbis(aminoethyl)ether compositions for the production of polyurethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[1997/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Savoca, Ann Coates Lescher
9 Scenic Drive
Bernville, PA 19506 / US
02 / Underwood, Richard Paul
1829 Kay Drive
Allentown, PA 18106 / US
03 / Van Court Carr, Richard
416 South 26th Street
Allentown, PA 18104 / US
04 / Emerick, James Stephen
3227 Carbon Street
Whitehall, PA 18052 / US
05 / Listemann, Mark Leo
128 Kohlers Hill Road
Kutztown, PA 19530 / US
[1997/14]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date96115409.325.09.1996
[1997/14]
Priority number, dateUS1995053475127.09.1995         Original published format: US 534751
[1997/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0765892
Date:02.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0765892
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/18
[1997/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/14]
TitleGerman:Aminopropylbis(aminoethyl)etherzusammensetzungen zur Herstellung von Polyurethanen[1997/14]
English:Aminopropylbis(aminoethyl)ether compositions for the production of polyurethanes[1997/14]
French:Des compositions d'aminopropylbis(aminoéthyl)éther pour préparer des polyuréthanes[1997/14]
Examination procedure14.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
04.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2000Fee for grant paid
03.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0102632  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 16; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2102410  (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 21; claim 1 *;
 [D]US4338408  (ZIMMERMAN ROBERT L, et al)