Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0811552

EP0811552 - Ship's rudder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Willi Becker Ingenieurbüro GmbH
Danziger Strasse 22
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2000/20]
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
Willi Becker Ingenieurbüro GmbH
Danziger Strasse 22
D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Plappert, Dieter
Wittenbergener Weg 10c
22559 Hamburg / DE
[1997/50]
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/50]Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date96115518.127.09.1996
[1997/50]
Priority number, dateDE1996209745U04.06.1996         Original published format: DE 29609745 U
[1997/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0811552
Date:10.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0811552
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:B63H25/38
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/50]
TitleGerman:Ruder für Seeschiffe[1997/50]
English:Ship's rudder[1997/50]
French:Gouvernail pour navires[1997/50]
Examination procedure19.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/50]
13.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.1999Fee for grant paid
30.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE2353934  (RAUKEMA HERKE) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE8613505U  (K.JOHANNSEN) [A] 1 * page 11 - page 13; figure - *