Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0768693

EP0768693 - Electromagnetic relay and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[2001/49]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
Former [1997/16]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hendel, Horst
Pertisauer Weg 45
12209 Berlin / DE
[1997/16]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Former [2001/25]Hirsch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date96115680.930.09.1996
[1997/16]
Priority number, dateDE199513761209.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19537612
[1997/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0768693
Date:16.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0768693
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0768693
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H49/00, H01H50/14, H01H50/28, H01H50/60
[1997/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/16]
TitleGerman:Elektromagnetisches Relais und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1997/16]
English:Electromagnetic relay and method for its manufacture[1997/16]
French:Relais électromagnétique et méthode pour sa fabrication[1997/16]
Examination procedure03.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
30.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
28.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.03.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2001Fee for grant paid
20.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4404442  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2541815  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE2515890  (EICHHOFF WERKE) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0281950  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3-7,14 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3843359  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7,15,16 * abstract *;
 [A]DE1659843U  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 8,9,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3834283  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 11-13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0246621  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3-7,14