Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0767436 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0767436



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 336
17.11.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
31.10.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.04.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 2
14.06.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
02.12.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 22
27.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.09.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.09.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
15.09.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
16.01.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.11.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
27.09.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.08.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
30.07.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
30.07.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
30.07.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
30.07.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
30.07.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
30.07.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.07.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.06.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 6
07.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
07.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2002 Description Search / examination 25
07.03.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
07.03.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
21.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.11.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.11.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
18.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
18.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
18.07.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.05.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.01.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.01.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.07.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.07.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.06.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.06.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.2000 European search report Search / examination 2
28.05.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.05.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 40
01.10.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.10.1996 Claims Search / examination 6
01.10.1996 Description Search / examination 25
01.10.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.1996 Drawings Search / examination 8
01.10.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.10.1996 Priority document Search / examination 26
01.10.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6