Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777203

EP0777203 - Improvements in or relating to modular gas meters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.03.2006  [2006/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Landis+Gyr Limited
Hortonwood 30 Telford
Shropshire TF1 7YG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Landis+Gyr Limited
Hortonwood 30
Telford Shropshire TF1 7YG / GB
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
SIEMENS METERING LIMITED
Manchester Road
Oldham, Lancashire OL9 7JS / GB
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
SIEMENS MEASUREMENTS LIMITED
Manchester Road
Oldham, Lancashire OL9 7JS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hamer, Mark Joseph
4 Garden Close, Smithy Bridge
Littleborough, Rochdale OL15 0EE / GB
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Humphrey-Evans, Edward John
Brand Protect
2nd Floor, Rowood House
Murdock Road
Bicester, OX26 4PP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Humphrey-Evans, Edward John
Humphrey-Evans Intellectual Property Services Limited 1 Hawkes Close
Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 2SZ / GB
Former [2003/23]Humphrey-Evans, Edward John , et al
c/o Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2003/01]Humphrey-Evans, Edward John
c/o Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [1997/23]Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Roke Manor Old Salisbury Lane
Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB
Application number, filing date96116393.812.10.1996
[1997/23]
Priority number, dateGB1995002468402.12.1995         Original published format: GB 9524684
[1997/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0777203
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0777203
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777203
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F15/00, G07F7/08, G01F15/00
[2000/14]
Former International [1997/23]G07F15/00, G07F7/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   LU,   NL [1997/23]
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen für oder in Bezug auf modulare Gaszähler[2002/39]
English:Improvements in or relating to modular gas meters[1997/23]
French:Perfectionnements dans ou relatifs aux compteurs à gaz modulaires[1997/23]
Former [1997/23]Verbesseringen für oder in Bezug auf modularen Gaszählern
Examination procedure13.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
27.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2002Fee for grant paid
23.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)12.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0419106  (SCHLUMBERGER IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 31 - column 7, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0333161  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 18; figure 2 *;
 [E]WO9603720  (MAGYAR GAZMERO TECHNIKA KFT [HU], et al) [E] 1-6 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 18; figures 1,2 * * page 14, line 7 - page 17, line 12; figures 4A,4B *;
 [E]WO9603721  (MAGYAR GAZMERO TECHNIKA KFT [HU], et al) [E] 1-6 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 2; figure 11 * * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 18; figures 12A,12B *;
 [DE]EP0762349  (SIEMENS MEASUREMENTS LTD [GB]) [DE] 1-6 * the whole document *