Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0769591

EP0769591 - Device for connecting an apparatus to a work top [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mecano Rapid GmbH
Dischingerstrasse 9
69123 Heidelberg / DE
[1997/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Demel, Otto
Schwetzinger Str. 110
69124 Heidelberg / DE
02 / Dolch, Gernot
Lahrer Str. 4
69126 Heidelberg / DE
03 / Huck, Thomas
Alterer Postweg 27
69307 Sandhausen / DE
04 / Weiner, Heiko
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str. 11
69509 Mörlenbach / DE
[1997/17]
Representative(s)Gornott, Dietmar
Katscher Habermann
Patentanwälte
Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/17]Gornott, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Zilleweg 29
64291 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date96116395.312.10.1996
[1997/17]
Priority number, dateDE199513856217.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19538562
DE199514120304.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19541203
[1997/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0769591
Date:23.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0769591
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:E03C1/33
[1997/17]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/17]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsvorrichtung für einen Geräteeinsatz[1997/17]
English:Device for connecting an apparatus to a work top[1997/17]
French:Dispositif pour fixer un appareil dans un plan de travail[1997/17]
Examination procedure12.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/17]
15.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1999Fee for grant paid
17.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3915325  (MECANO SIMMONDS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 14; figures 1-3 *;
 [YD]DE3325345  (MECANO SIMMONDS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-4,8 * the whole document *