Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0770959

EP0770959 - Flash translation layer clean-up method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/18]Flash translation layer clean-up system
[2001/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCM Microsystems, Inc.
47211 Bayside Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]For all designated states
SCM Microsystems, Inc.
131 Albright Way
Los Gatos, California 95030 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jenett, Detlef
Am Drosselberg 54
D-99097 Erfurt / DE
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys.
Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date96116858.021.10.1996
[1997/18]
Priority number, dateUS1995054947627.10.1995         Original published format: US 549476
[1997/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0770959
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0770959
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/02
[1997/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Aufräumen eines Flash-Speichers mit Übersetzungsschicht[2001/48]
English:Flash translation layer clean-up method[2001/48]
French:Procédé pour nettoyage d'une mémoire flash avec couche de traduction[2001/48]
Former [1997/18]System und Verfahren zum Aufräumen eines Flash-Speichers mit Übersetzungsschicht
Former [1997/18]Flash translation layer clean-up system
Former [1997/18]Système et procédé pour nettoyage d'une mémoire flash avec couche de traduction
Examination procedure31.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
30.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2002Fee for grant paid
25.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9420906  (SYSTEMS LTD M [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 8 - line 11 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 11 * * figures 3,4,7 *;
 [D]US5404485  (BAN AMIR [IL]);
 [XA]US5341339  (WELLS STEVEN E [US]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 7, line 5 - line 25 * * column 7, line 42 - column 63 * * column 10, line 15 - column 12, line 5 * [A] 4;
 [A]EP0615184  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,4,8 * column 7, line 5 - column 9, line 27 *
 [X]  STRASS H, "UNAUFFAELLIGE BRUECKENBAUER", ELEKTRONIK, (19941031), vol. 43, no. 22, pages 146 - 150, XP000474171 [X] 1-3 * page 149, column R, line 1 - page 150, column L, line 18 * * figure 2 *
 [X]  FRIEDMANN A, "BLOCK FLASH FILE SYSTEMS DELIVER MASS STORAGE FOR MOBILE COMPUTING", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, (19941221), page 84, 86, 88, XP000429678 [X] 1 * page 86, column 1, line 23 - column 3, line 20 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5404485