Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0770600

EP0770600 - Succinimide derivative, process for production and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [1997/18]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamabuchi, Akira
1-2-40-255, Hirata
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Takeyama, Naoki
2-2-43, Shoya
Settu-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Tomioka, Jun
2-14-7, Mefu
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo / JP
04 / Osaki, Haruyoshi
2-10-3-311, Sonehigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1997/18]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date96117274.928.10.1996
[1997/18]
Priority number, dateJP1995028023327.10.1995         Original published format: JP 28023395
JP1996015778319.06.1996         Original published format: JP 15778396
[1997/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0770600
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0770600
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/46, G03F7/004
[1997/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/18]
TitleGerman:Succinamid-Derivat, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendung[1997/18]
English:Succinimide derivative, process for production and use thereof[1997/18]
French:Dérivé de succinimide, procédé de production et utilisation[1997/18]
Examination procedure23.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/52]
06.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1999Fee for grant paid
23.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199904   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0632327  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 4 - page 5 * * claim 5 *;
 [A]JPH07181678  ;
 [A]JPH07244378
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 950, no. 7, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 950, no. 9, [A] * abstract *
by applicantJPH05181279