blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0773074 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0773074



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 88
28.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.04.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.03.2000 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
16.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
18.06.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
11.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.06.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
18.02.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
30.10.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.10.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
30.10.1996 Description Search / examination 11
30.10.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.1996 Drawings Search / examination 4
30.10.1996 Priority document Search / examination 19
30.10.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6