blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0773074


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
07.04.2000 Change - applicant published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]
07.04.2000 Change - representative published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]
11.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
24.09.1999 Renewal fee
27.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
23.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.03.1999 First examination report
09.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
20.10.1998 Renewal fee
27.03.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.05.1997 [1997/20]
27.03.1997 Request for examination filed published on  14.05.1997 [1997/20]