blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0773074
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59604288D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
DE59604288 30.10.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3881073BGlobal Dossier 14.02.2007B2
JPH09164427 24.06.1997A
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0773074Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0773074 14.05.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT189141T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2189826 12.10.2004C
CA2189826 14.05.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1082854C 17.04.2002C
CN1158765 10.09.1997A
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19542184 15.05.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2142535T 16.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100466676B 17.08.2005B1
KR970026853 24.06.1997A
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2182857 27.05.2002C2
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW314481B 01.09.1997B
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5769302 23.06.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19542184 13.11.1995