Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773074

EP0773074 - Horizontal strip-accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Demag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/21]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1997/20]For all designated states
SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Withold, Richert
Am Hackeberg 34
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
02 / Zembol, Paul
Deceased / DE
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Valentin, Ekkehard , et al
Patentanwälte
Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse
Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Former [1997/20]Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date96117373.930.10.1996
[1997/20]
Priority number, dateDE199514218413.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19542184
[1997/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773074
Date:14.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773074
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:B21C49/00
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1997/20]
TitleGerman:Horizontaler Bandspeicher[1997/20]
English:Horizontal strip-accumulator[1997/20]
French:Accumulateur de bandes horizontal[1997/20]
Examination procedure13.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/20]
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.1999Fee for grant paid
16.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]AT299103B  (VOEST AG) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]DE3842132  (MANNESMAN) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [DA]DE1953169  (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN);
 [DA]EP0110864  (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT])
by applicantEP0110864
 EP0388708
 DE1953169
 AT299103B