Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0771531

EP0771531 - Stable edible oil composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lipidia Holding S.A.
231, Val des Bons Malades
2121 Luxembourg-Kirchberg / LU
[1997/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Silkeberg, Alf
Apartado 372
03590 Altea / ES
[1997/19]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/19]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Postfach 40 14 68
80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date96117404.230.10.1996
[1997/19]
Priority number, dateUS1995000638902.11.1995         Original published format: US 6389
US1995000699021.11.1995         Original published format: US 6990
US1995000773729.11.1995         Original published format: US 7737
US1995000773629.11.1995         Original published format: US 7736
US1996058852418.01.1996         Original published format: US 588524
[1997/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0771531
Date:07.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0771531
Date:17.12.1997
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0771531
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:A23D9/00, C11B1/06, C11B1/10, C11B3/00, C11B5/00
[1997/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/19]
TitleGerman:Stabile essbare Ölzusammensetzung[1997/19]
English:Stable edible oil composition[1997/19]
French:Composition stable contenant de l'huile comestible[1997/19]
Examination procedure10.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
23.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2002Fee for grant paid
09.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]FI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2005/21]FI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/29]SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH05140583  ;
 [YA]GB1053807  (HELMUT BOCK) [Y] 19 * claims 1,2,7,14 * * claims 3-6 * [A] 20;
 [DA]EP0477825  (SILKEBERG ALF [ES]) [DA] 1,13,23,28 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]JPH0269142  ;
 [A]JPH02189394  ;
 [A]JPS6078542  ;
 [A]JPH0411838
 [PX]  - B. FITCH HAUMANN, "The goal: tastier and 'healthier' fried foods", INFORM., CHAMPAIGN US, (1996), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 320 - 334, XP002042724 [PX] 1,23,28,32 * page 321, column 3, paragraph 5 - page 325, column 1, paragraph L *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 27, Database accession no. 93-217127, XP002042726 & JPH05140583 A 19930608 (AJINOMOTO KK) [Y] 19 * abstract *
 [A]  - G. KAJIMOTO ET AL., "Influence of blend ratio of vegetable oils on their thermal oxidation and decomposition of tocopherol", JOURNAL OF JAPANESE SOCIETY OF NUTRITION AND FOOD SCIENCE, JP, (1991), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 499 - 505, XP002042725 [A] 1,23,28 * page 499, Summary *; page 500; table 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900529), vol. 014, no. 250, Database accession no. (C - 0723), & JP02069142 A 19900308 (HIROTOMO OCHI) [A] 1,23,28 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 36, Database accession no. 90-270720, XP002042727 & JPH02189394 A 19900725 (TSUKISHIMA SHOKUHIN) [A] 1,23,28 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850829), vol. 009, no. 211, Database accession no. (C - 300), & JP60078542 A 19850504 (NITSUKEN SUTAMII KK) [A] 1,23,28,32 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 09, Database accession no. 92-068538, XP002042728 & JPH0411838 A 19920116 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM KK) [A] 1,23,28 * abstract *