Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0775871

EP0775871 - Baking and roasting oven muffle with a heat insulating coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH
Muggenhoferstrasse 135
90429 Nürnberg / DE
[1997/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Greiner, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Dahlienstrasse 27
90451 Nürnberg / DE
02 / Schönweiss, Horst, Dipl.-Ing.
Bachstrasse 15
90610 Winkelhaid / DE
[1997/22]
Application number, filing date96118074.212.11.1996
[1997/22]
Priority number, dateDE1995218429U21.11.1995         Original published format: DE 29518429 U
[1997/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775871
Date:28.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0775871
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:F24C15/34
[1997/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/22]
TitleGerman:Back- und Bratofenmuffel mit einer wärmeisolierenden Umhüllung[1997/22]
English:Baking and roasting oven muffle with a heat insulating coating[1997/22]
French:Moufle de four rôtir et cuire au four avec envelope calorifuge[1997/22]
Examination procedure23.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
30.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1999Fee for grant paid
07.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR05.04.2000
GB12.11.2000
[2002/32]
Former [2002/12]GB12.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2549834  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [X] 1-4,6 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0709624  (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 *