Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774279

EP0774279 - Water additive and method for fire prevention and fire extinguishing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STOCKHAUSEN GmbH & Co. KG
Bäkerpfad 25
47805 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
STOCKHAUSEN GmbH & CO. KG
Bäkerpfad 25
47805 Krefeld / DE
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Stockhausen, Inc.
2408 Doyle Street
Greensboro, North Carolina 27406 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hicks, Robert David
3110 Fairbluff Court
Summerfield, North Carolina 27310 / US
02 / Mills, Jane Elisabet
1800 N. Elm Street, E2
Greensboro, North Carolina 27408 / US
03 / Hsu, Whei-Neen
4913 Jessup Grove Road
Greensboro, North Carolina 27410 / US
04 / Agne, Robert Andrew
1729F Fairfax Road
Greensboro, North Carolina 27407 / US
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Klöpsch, Gerald , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Klöpsch, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät, Benrather Schlossallee 53
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1997/21]Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96118195.513.11.1996
[1997/21]
Priority number, dateUS1995055786214.11.1995         Original published format: US 557862
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0774279
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0774279
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:A62D1/00
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1997/21]
TitleGerman:Wasser-Zusatz und Verfahren zur Verhütung und Löschen von Bränden[1997/21]
English:Water additive and method for fire prevention and fire extinguishing[1997/21]
French:Additif pour l'eau et méthode pour la prévention et extinction du feu[1997/21]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
19.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
22.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1999Fee for grant paid
17.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199803   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1999
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH03292969  ;
 [DY]EP0482703  (AKZO NV [NL]) [DY] 1-5 * page 3, lines 26-37; claim - *;
 [DX]EP0199897  (BLUECHER HUBERT [DE], et al) [DX] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [X]JPH01213307
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 06, Database accession no. 92-046363, XP002025152 & JPH03292969 A 19911224 (OSAKA YUKI KAGAKU K) [X] 1-16 * abstract * [Y] 1-5
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 40, Database accession no. 89-289790, XP002025153 & JPH01213307 A 19890828 (OSAKA YUUKI KAGAKU) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4078133
 US4070321
by applicantUS5190110
 US4978460
 US3758641
 US3284393
 US4021399
 US4925884
 US4786681
 US3247171