Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773555

EP0773555 - Neutron-shielding hydraulic hardening material and method of manufacturing neutron shields using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN NUCLEAR CYCLE DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
4-49 Muramatsu Tokai-mura Naka-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
Mitsui Engineering and Shipbuilding Co, Ltd.
6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TAKENAKA CORPORATION
1-13, 4 chome, Hom-machi Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
For all designated states
TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
3-8-1, Nishikanda Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8357 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
JAPAN NUCLEAR CYCLE DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
4-49 Muramatsu Tokai-mura
Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD
6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TAKENAKA CORPORATION
1-13, 4 chome, Hom-machi Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
For all designated states
TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
3-8-1, Nishikanda
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8357 / JP
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
JAPAN NUCLEAR CYCLE DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE
4-49 Muramatsu Tokai-mura
Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD
6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TAKENAKA CORPORATION
1-13, 4 chome, Hom-machi Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
For all designated states
CHICHIBU ONODA CEMENT CORPORATION
14-1, Nishishinbashi 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1997/20]For all designated states
DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO KAIHATSU JIGYODAN
9-13, Akasaka 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
For all designated states
MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD
6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TAKENAKA CORPORATION
1-13, 4 chome, Hom-machi Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
For all designated states
CHICHIBU ONODA CEMENT CORPORATION
14-1, Nishishinbashi 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagai, Takayuki, c/o Doryokuro Kakunenryo Kaihatsu
Jigyodan, Tokai Works, 4-33, Oaza Matsumura
Tokaimura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki / JP
02 / Seshimo, Takuya, c/o Doryokuro Kakunenryo Kaihatsu
Jigyodan, Tokai Works, 4-33, Oaza Matsumura
Tokaimura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki / JP
03 / Tanuma, Hiroyuki, c/o Mitsui Eng. & Shipbd.Co.Ltd.
6-4, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Otagawa, Masaaki, c/o Takenaka Corporation
21-1, Ginza 8-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Terai, Masafumi, c/o Takenaka Corporation
21-1, Ginza 8-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
06 / Uchida, Shunichiro, Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp.
4-2, Osaku 2-chome, Sakura-shi
Chiba / JP
07 / Takuma, Yasuhisa, Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp.
4-2, Osaku 2-chome, Sakura-shi
Chiba / JP
08 / Fujita, Hideki, Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp.
4-2, Osaku 2-chome, Sakura-chi
Chiba / JP
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd , et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date96118207.813.11.1996
[1997/20]
Priority number, dateJP1995029438513.11.1995         Original published format: JP 29438595
[1997/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773555
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773555
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:G21F1/04
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/20]
TitleGerman:Hydraulisch erhärtendes Neutronschutzmaterial und Verfahren zur Neutronschutzherstellung derselben[1997/20]
English:Neutron-shielding hydraulic hardening material and method of manufacturing neutron shields using the same[1997/20]
French:Matériau de protection contre les neutrons à durcissement hydraulique et procédé de fabrication d'écrans neutroniques qui l'utilise[1999/43]
Former [1997/20]Matériau de protection contre les neutrons à durcissement hydraulique et procédé de fabrication d'écrans neutroniques qui l'utilisant
Examination procedure10.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/33]
26.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2000Fee for grant paid
05.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]FR2546331  (ROBATEL SLPI [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 2 - line 34 * [A] 3;
 [Y]JPH01147399  ;
 [A]JPH0687639  ;
 [A]JPH07165477  ;
 [A]JPS5416098
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 29, Database accession no. 89-210259, XP002023882 & JPH01147399 A 19890609 (KURARAY KK) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940630), vol. 018, no. 347, Database accession no. (C - 1219), & JP06087639 A 19940329 (KAO CORP) [A] 4,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 006, & JP07165477 A 19950627 (DAIDO CONCRETE KOGYO KK) [A] 4,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 11, Database accession no. 79-20806B, XP002023883 & JPS5416098 A 19790206 (NIPPON ASBESTOS KK) [A] 1 * abstract *