blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0774865 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0774865



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 258
09.02.2007 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.02.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 2
02.02.2007 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2006 Description Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.01.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.01.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
04.08.2005 Description Search / examination 6
04.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.07.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
15.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) Search / examination 1
06.03.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
14.11.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.11.1996 Claims Search / examination 6
14.11.1996 Description Search / examination 47
14.11.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.1996 Drawings Search / examination 48
14.11.1996 Priority document Search / examination 53
14.11.1996 Priority document Search / examination 47
14.11.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6