blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0774865


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.03.2007 Withdrawal of application published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
29.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.10.2006 First examination report
12.05.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.01.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.08.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.03.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.03.2005 First examination report
03.12.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2002 Renewal fee
07.12.2001 Renewal fee
28.11.2000 Renewal fee
09.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.07.2000 [2000/30]
20.04.2000 Publication of search report published on  07.06.2000 [2000/23]
30.11.1999 Renewal fee
01.12.1998 Renewal fee
04.04.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.05.1997 [1997/21]