blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0774865

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure02.02.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
21.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:21.05.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:07.06.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000525
 
Event date:27.04.2005 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050315
 
Event date:15.11.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050315
 
Event date:18.04.2007 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20070202