Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774865

EP0774865 - Video camera with high speed mode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kikuchi, Kenichi
1-1-15-208, Fukono
Daito-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Akio
1-21-30, Sugiyamate
Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Toba, Akira
4-1-15, Setoguchi
Hirano-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date96118290.414.11.1996
[1997/21]
Priority number, dateJP1995030022617.11.1995         Original published format: JP 30022695
JP1995030022517.11.1995         Original published format: JP 30022595
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0774865
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0774865
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/335, H04N5/232
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/21]
TitleGerman:Videokamera mit Hochgeschwindigkeitsmodus[1997/21]
English:Video camera with high speed mode[1997/21]
French:Caméra vidéo avec mode à grande vitesse[1997/21]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
15.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
21.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0434981  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,15,19 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 33; claims 1,2 * [A] 7-14,16-18;
 [XA]EP0341692  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 2-19;
 [XA]US5376964  (SOGA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 21 - line 42; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-19;
 [X]US5172234  (ARITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 20 * column 2, line 49 - line 64; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0282993  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 20 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 2 * * column 6, line 40 - line 53; figure 1 *
by applicantJPS63250287
 JPH07212657
 US19940188543