Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0764961

EP0764961 - Remote control residential circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jaeschke, James Ralph
2314 Misty Lane
Waukesha, Wisconsin 53086 / US
02 / Smith, Richard George
1650 Waukesha Road
Caledonia, Wisconsin 53108 / US
03 / Kihn, Robert Andrew
W149 N7611 Sylvan Lane
Menomonee Falls, Wisconsin 53051 / US
04 / Streich, Herbert
4947 North Wildwood Avenue
Whitefish Bay, Wisconsin 53217 / US
05 / Grass, William Ernest
8183-S North 107th Street
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53224 / US
06 / Piber, Earl Thomas
803 Byron Drive
Oconomowoc, Wisconsin 53066 / US
07 / Moldovan, Peter Klaus
W8425 County Trunk - Highway V
Cascade, Wisconsin 53011 / US
08 / Clarey, Robert John
21360 Partridge Court
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US
[1997/13]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date96118434.823.09.1992
[1997/13]
Priority number, dateUS1991076802930.09.1991         Original published format: US 768029
[1997/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0764961
Date:26.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0764961
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01H73/00, H01H73/12
[1997/13]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [1997/13]
TitleGerman:Fernbedienter Haushaltsschutzschalter[1997/13]
English:Remote control residential circuit breaker[1997/13]
French:Disjoncteur domestique télécommandé[1997/13]
Examination procedure02.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.1999Fee for grant paid
03.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92308629.2  / EP0535844
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000  29.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000  29.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2001/02]
Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
04.01.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.07.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.07.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
[2001/09]
Former [2000/52]CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
Former [2000/50]CH15.05.2000
LI15.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2086658  (ASEA AB) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,10 *;
 [A]US4164719  (CLAVELL JACK [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3432476  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]EP0364950  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2020903  (GOULD INC) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS3081386
 US4549153
 US4616206
 US4929919