Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0776845

EP0776845 - Adjustable separating slot for paper sheets and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mathias Bäuerle GmbH
Gewerbehallestrasse 7 - 11
78112 St Georgen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
Mathias Bäuerle GmbH
Gewerbehallestrasse 7 - 11
D-78112 St Georgen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pittelkow, Ralph
Rossberg 23
78112 St. Georgen / DE
02 / King, Werner
Kammermartinsdobel 6
78730 Lauterbach / DE
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Neymeyer, Franz
Haselweg 20
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Haselweg 20
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date96118493.419.11.1996
[1997/23]
Priority number, dateDE1995219061U01.12.1995         Original published format: DE 29519061 U
[1997/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0776845
Date:04.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0776845
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65H3/52
[1997/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/23]
TitleGerman:Einstellbarer Vereinzelungsspalt für Papierbogen od.dgl[1999/20]
English:Adjustable separating slot for paper sheets and the like[1997/23]
French:Fente de séparation adjustable pour des feuilles en papier et similaire[1997/23]
Former [1997/23]Einstellbare Vereinzelungsspalt für Papierbogen od.dgl
Examination procedure16.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/38]
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3412574  (BAEUERLE GMBH MATHIAS) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0487326  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0569965  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *
by applicantDE3412574