Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0776941

EP0776941 - Method of making a polydiorganosiloxane-silica mixture, the resulting mixture and a room temperature curing sealant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gutek, Beth Irene
3550 N. River Road
Freeland, Michigan 48623 / US
02 / Lower, Loren Dale
612 Sylvan Lane
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
03 / Spells, Sherwood
5609 Lamplighter Lane
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Fleischer, Holm Herbert , et al
polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann, Dr. Hans-Günther Sternagel, Dr. Hans Dörries, Sander Aue 30
51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date96118822.425.11.1996
[1997/23]
Priority number, dateUS1995056475729.11.1995         Original published format: US 564757
[1997/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0776941
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0776941
Date:24.09.1997
[1997/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0776941
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/04, C08K9/06
[1997/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polydiorganosiloxan-Kieselsäure-Mischung, die so erhaltene Mischung und bei Umgebungstemperatur härtende Dichtungsmasse[1999/52]
English:Method of making a polydiorganosiloxane-silica mixture, the resulting mixture and a room temperature curing sealant[1997/23]
French:Procédé de préparation d'un mélange de polydiorganosiloxane-silice, le mélange obtenu et composition d'étanchéité reticulable à température ambiante[1999/52]
Former [1997/23]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polydiorganosiloxan-Silica-Mischung, die so erhaltene Mischung und bei Umgebungstemperatur härtende Dichtungsmasse
Former [1997/23]Procédé de préparation d'un mélange de polydiorganosiloxane-silica, le mélange obtenu et composition d'étanchéité reticulable à température ambiante
Examination procedure14.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/03]
16.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2000Fee for grant paid
14.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AX]US4724167  (EVANS EDWIN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1,2; claims 1,9 * [X] 3,4;
 [AX]EP0676445  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 50 * * page 4, line 26 - line 28; claim 1 * [X] 3-5;
 [A]US4585830  (SWEET RANDALL P [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 61 - line 66; example 1 *;
 [AX]EP0497318  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1 * [X] 3-5
 [A]  XP002033035, [A] 1 * Database PAJ/JPO & JP-A-7133433 (Shin-Etsu) 23/5 95 *abstract*
by applicantUSRE29760E
 US3175993
 US4898910
 US4871827
 US4657967
 US4973623
 US3274145