EP0765751 - Ink jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Seiji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawakami, Kazuhisa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Masahiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Ohshima, Keiichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th. Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119104.6 | 11.03.1994 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19930077584 | 11.03.1993 Original published format: JP 7758493 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765751 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765751 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
B41J2/16532 (EP);
B41J2/1721 (EP);
B41J2/17513 (EP);
B41J2/17523 (EP);
B41J2/17546 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | [1997/14] | English: | Ink jet recording apparatus | [1997/14] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1997/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2000/03: (deleted) | EPB 2000/03: (deleted) | EPB 2000/03: (deleted) | EPB 1997/20: Teilanmeldung 97102919.4 eingereicht am 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/20: Divisional application 97102919.4 filed on 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/20: Demande divisionnaire 97102919.4 déposée le 21/02/97 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 24.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94103799.6 / EP0615846 | Divisional application(s) | EP00100380.5 / EP1000747 | EP97102919.4 / EP0778140 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0452119 (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1-4; | [PA]EP0552472 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-3 | by applicant | JPH01125239 | JPH02187364 | EP0452119 |