Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0779192

EP0779192 - Windscreen wiper arrangement for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1997/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Geis, Andreas
Schlossstr. 83
77815 Buehl / DE
[1997/25]
Application number, filing date96119129.329.11.1996
[1997/25]
Priority number, dateDE199514686215.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19546862
DE199611959315.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19619593
[1997/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0779192
Date:18.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0779192
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/34
[1997/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/25]
TitleGerman:Wischanlage für Scheiben von Kraftfahrzeugen[1997/25]
English:Windscreen wiper arrangement for motor vehicles[1997/25]
French:Dispositif d'essuie-glace pour des véhicules automobiles[1997/25]
Examination procedure18.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/09]
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1999Fee for grant paid
28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3599270  (MORI YOICHI) [A] 1 * column W *