blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0776976

EP0776976 - A process for the industrial preparation of phosphatidylserine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2014Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 30.07.2014  [2014/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHEMI S.p.A.
Via dei Lavoratori, 54
20092 Cinisello Balsamo (Milano) / IT
[2001/24]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
CHEMI S.p.A.
Via Vadisi, 5
I-03010 Patrica (Frosinone) / IT
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
ITALFARMACO SUD S.p.A.
Via Vadisi, 5
03010 Patrica (Frosinone) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / De Ferra, Lorenzo
Via Vadisi, 5
03010 Patrica (FR) / IT
02 / Massardo, Pietro
Via Vadisi, 5
03010 Patrica (FR) / IT
03 / Piccolo, Oreste
Via Vadisi, 5
03010 Patrica (FR) / IT
04 / Servi, Stefano
Via Volvinio, 22
20141 Milano / IT
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Pistolesi, Roberto, et al
Dragotti & Associati Srl
Via Nino Bixio, 7
20129 Milano / IT
[2014/31]
Former [2003/42]Pistolesi, Roberto, et al
Dragotti & Associati SRL Galleria San Babila 4/c
20122 Milano / IT
Former [1999/11]Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr., et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8
20122 Milano / IT
Former [1998/39]Spadaro, Marco, et al
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini 8
20122 Milano / IT
Former [1997/23]Spadaro, Marco
Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini 8
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date96119350.503.12.1996
[1997/23]
Priority number, dateUS1995057000008.12.1995         Original published format: US 570000
[1997/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0776976
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0776976
Date:10.09.1997
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0776976
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0776976
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1997
ClassificationIPC:C12P13/04, C12P13/06, // (C12P13/06, C12R1:465)
[2014/31]
CPC:
C12P13/06 (EP,KR,US); C07F9/103 (EP,US); C12P13/04 (EP,US);
Y10S435/886 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1997/36]C12P13/04, C12P13/06, // (C12P13/06, C12R1:465)
Former IPC [1997/23]C12P13/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur industriellen Herstellung von Phosphatidylserine[1997/23]
English:A process for the industrial preparation of phosphatidylserine[1997/23]
French:Procédé de préparation industrielle de phosphatidylsérine[1997/23]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure24.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/04]
29.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2001Fee for grant paid
11.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.06.2007Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP98111111.5  / EP0922707
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.04.2002  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill Texturizing Solutions Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Ausschlager Elbdeich 62
20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Erika-Mann-Straße 9
80636 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/37]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2002  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill Texturizing Solutions Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Ausschlager Elbdeich 62
20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [2009/10]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2002  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill Texturizing Solutions Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Ausschlager Elbdeich 62
20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/43]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2002  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Cargill Texturizing Solutions GmbH & Co. KG
Ausschlager Elbdeich 62
20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiltl, Elmar, et al, et al
Diehl & Partner Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/25]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2002  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Degussa BioActives Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Lise-Meitner-Strasse 34
85354 Freising / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiltl, Elmar, Dr.
DIEHL.GLAESER.HILTL & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
24.06.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2003Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.02.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.06.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.03.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.05.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.03.2004Appeal received No.  T0654/04
21.05.2004Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2004/46]
04.03.2005Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2005/10]
30.03.2005Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2005/14]
12.04.2005Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2005/16]
31.05.2005Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
GR12.10.2001
IE03.12.2001
CH31.12.2005
LI31.12.2005
[2007/03]
Former [2004/51]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
GR12.10.2001
IE03.12.2001
Former [2004/42]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
IE03.12.2001
Former [2003/46]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
Former [2003/09]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
Former [2002/29]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
Former [2002/25]AT11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
Former [2002/15]AT11.07.2001
SE11.10.2001
Former [2002/05]SE11.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[DA]  - LEKH RAJ JUNEJA ET AL., "Conversion of phosphatidylcholine to phosphatidylserine by various phospholipases D in the presence of L- or D-serine", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1989), vol. 1003, no. 3, pages 277 - 283, XP000645929 [DA] 1-8,12-14 * abstract * * page 278, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 4 * * page 278, column R, paragraph L - page 279, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 279, column R, paragraph L; tables I,II * * page 281, column R, paragraph 2 *
 [DA]  - P. COMFURIUS ET AL., "The enzymatic synthesis of Phosphatidylserine and purification by CM-cellulose column chromatography", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1977), vol. 488, pages 36 - 42, XP000603420 [DA] 1-8,12,13 * abstract * * page 37, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 37, paragraph L - page 38, paragraph 2 * * page 42, paragraph 3 *
 [DA]  - YOSHIO OKAHATA ET AL., "Simple transphosphatidylation of phospholipids catalysed by a lipid-coated phospholipase D in organic solvents", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, LETCHWORTH GB, (19950407), no. 7, pages 919 - 925, XP002029035 [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * page 919, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 920, column R, paragraph 2 - page 922, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 923, column R, paragraph 2 *
by applicantJPH0279996B
 JPS63123389B
 JPS6336791
 JPS6336792B
    - COMFURIUS P. ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1977), vol. 488, page 36
    - YAMANE T. ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1989), vol. 1003, page 277
    - OKAHATA Y. ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1995), vol. 1, page 919
    - BIOTECHN. TECHN., (1993), vol. 7, page 795
otherJPH05336983K
 JPS63123389K
 JPS63123389
 JPH05336983
    - SPECTRUM LABORATORIES, "Chemical fact sheet - cas #60297", CHEMICAL FACT SHEET, pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.speclab.com/compound/c60297.htm, XP003011423
    - "Final concept paper -- Q3C: Impurities: Guideline for residual solvents", FEDERAL REGISTER, (19971224), vol. 62, no. 247, pages 1 - 24+COVER, XP003011424
    - BUDAVARI S. ET AL., The Merck index, USA, MERCK AND CO., INC., (1989), page 1073, XP003011425
    - "Documents 'Phenomenex' about solvents properties.", URL: http://www.acdlabs.com/partners/phenomenex.html, (20070604), XP003011426
    - "Lecithin", WADE A., WELLER P.J., Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, 2nd ed., (1994), pages 267 - 268, XP003011427
    - "Ether", THE SOCIETY OF JAPANESE PHARMACOPOEIA, The pharmacopoeia of Japan, JAPAN, (1986), pages 531 - 532, XP003011428
OppositionJPS6336792
 JPS63123389
 JPH05336983
    - KOKUSHO ET AL., BIOSC. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 57, pages 1302 - 1305
    - TAKAMI ET AL., BIOSC. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 58, pages 2140 - 2144
    - IWASAKI ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 42, pages 290 - 299
    - RAJ JUNEJA ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1989), vol. 1003, pages 277 - 283
    - Kamata et al., 1993, English abstract
    - "Riedel-de Haën catalogue", (2003), pages 1272 - 1273
    - OKAHATA ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1995), vol. 1, pages 919 - 925
    - "Spectrum Laboratories Chemical Facts Sheet-Cas 60297: diethyl ether"
    - FEDERAL REGISTER, (19971224), vol. 62, no. 247, pages 67377 - 67388
    - AINLEY WADE AND PAUL J WELLER, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, (1994), pages 267 - 268
    - The Pharmacopoeia of Japan, (1986), pages 531 - 532
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.