Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0776976 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0776976



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 874
03.07.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
23.05.2014 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
23.05.2014 French translation of claims Opposition 5
23.05.2014 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
23.05.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
20.03.2014 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
06.08.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
13.01.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
12.01.2012 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
04.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Opposition 1
19.09.2008 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Request for a change of address - opponent Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Annex Opposition 5
24.06.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
24.06.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.06.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
24.06.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.06.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 4
19.05.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 1
19.05.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 2
19.05.2008 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 2
28.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.02.2008 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 1
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 1
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Claims Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
31.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.12.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
28.12.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
21.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
30.10.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.10.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.09.2007 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 4
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2007 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
17.07.2007 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 25
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 3
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 4
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 2
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 5
08.06.2007 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 4
08.06.2007 Observations by third parties Opposition 12
08.06.2007 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 19
08.06.2007 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 8
15.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
21.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2007 Claims Opposition 2
29.01.2007 Claims Opposition 2
29.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.01.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
25.01.2007 Claims Opposition 2
25.01.2007 Claims Opposition 2
25.01.2007 Claims Opposition 1
25.01.2007 Claims Opposition 2
25.01.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.10.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
12.10.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.09.2006 Refund of fees Appeal 1
29.08.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
29.08.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
24.08.2006 Refund of fees Appeal 1
24.08.2006 Refund of fees Appeal 1
19.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.04.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
27.02.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
02.02.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.02.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
25.01.2006 Claims Appeal 5
25.01.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.01.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
25.01.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
23.01.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 7
23.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
23.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
23.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
24.11.2005 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.11.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.11.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.11.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
22.11.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.11.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.11.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.11.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.10.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.09.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
23.09.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.09.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.09.2005 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.09.2005 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
13.07.2005 Refund of fees Appeal 1
27.06.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 12
19.04.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
07.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.01.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.01.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.12.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
05.11.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
12.10.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.10.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
04.06.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.06.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.06.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.06.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.05.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
01.04.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.03.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.03.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.01.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
23.01.2004 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.01.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2003 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
02.12.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
26.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.11.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.11.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
31.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.10.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
31.10.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
29.10.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.10.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.10.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
02.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.09.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.09.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 2
27.08.2003 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
27.08.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
04.08.2003 Authorisation Opposition 1
04.08.2003 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
31.07.2003 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
25.07.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.12.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
20.12.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
22.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.06.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.04.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.04.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.04.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.04.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.04.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.04.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
30.05.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.05.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
24.04.2001 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
09.01.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.01.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.10.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
14.12.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.12.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.08.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.06.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 6
16.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
19.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
29.01.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.01.1999 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 5
10.08.1998 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.06.1998 Request for assignment Search / examination 9
04.05.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
30.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
29.12.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.07.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.07.1997 European search report Search / examination 4
28.04.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.04.1997 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
30.01.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
24.01.1997 Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material Search / examination 2
22.01.1997 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 1
22.01.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.12.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.12.1996 Priority document Search / examination 22
03.12.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.12.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
03.12.1996 Description Search / examination 14
03.12.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.12.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6