Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0765695

EP0765695 - Acoustic resonator driving system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MacroSonix Corp.
1054 Technology Park Drive Glen Allen
Virginia 23060 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
MacroSonix Corp.
1054 Technology Park Drive
Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lucas, Timothy S.
P.O. Box 980
Glen Allen, Virginia 23060-0980 / US
[1997/14]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date96119353.910.05.1993
[1997/14]
Priority number, dateUS1992088133911.05.1992         Original published format: US 881339
[1997/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0765695
Date:02.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0765695
Date:10.09.1997
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0765695
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B06B1/04, G10K11/04
[1997/37]
Former International [1997/14]B06B1/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/14]
TitleGerman:Antriebssystem für akustischen Resonator[1997/14]
English:Acoustic resonator driving system[1997/14]
French:Dispositif d'excitation pour résonateur acoustique[1997/14]
Examination procedure27.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
23.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93303587.5  / EP0570177
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0331428  (WESTERN ATLAS INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 51; figure 4 *;
 [AD]US5020977  (LUCAS TIMOTHY S [US]) [AD] 1-4 * column 21, line 6 - line 31; figure 29 *