blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0779378


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
01.06.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
09.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2001 [2001/17]
12.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2001 [2001/09]
05.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2001 [2001/08]
01.12.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
17.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  02.02.2000 [2000/05]
23.11.1999 Renewal fee
22.10.1999 Change - representative published on  08.12.1999 [1999/49]
05.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
17.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.12.1998 Renewal fee
18.11.1998 Examination report or reply
09.10.1998 First examination report
07.10.1998 Examination report or reply
15.08.1997 Publication of search report published on  01.10.1997 [1997/40]
02.05.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.06.1997 [1997/25]
02.05.1997 Request for examination filed published on  18.06.1997 [1997/25]