blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0779378
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2994287BGlobal Dossier 27.12.1999B2
JPH09285918 04.11.1997A
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0779378Global Dossier 02.02.2000B1
EP0779378 01.10.1997A3
EP0779378 18.06.1997A2
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT189485T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CH690439 15.09.2000A5
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69606512D 09.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69606512T 10.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2143130T 01.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5858136 12.01.1999A
Priority number Date
CH349195 11.12.1995